Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Liagre

Deceased

Bishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1883BornTourcoing
5 Jun 190925.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 193854.5AppointedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
4 May 193854.6Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
10 Aug 195571.9DiedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France

MicroData Summary for Louis Liagre:
Bishop Louis Liagre (born , died ) Bishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes)

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015