Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin-Roch de Menou de Charnisai

Deceased

Bishop of La Rochelle, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1681Born
Apr 1707³25.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Oct 172948.4SelectedBishop of La Rochelle, France
14 Aug 173049.2ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle, France
10 Sep 173049.3Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle, France
26 Nov 176786.5DiedBishop of La Rochelle, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustin-Roch de Menou de Charnisai
Bishop Augustin-Roch de Menou de Charnisai (born , died ) Bishop of La Rochelle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMenon

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast