Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Corazon Tumbagahan Tala-oc

Bishop of Kalibo, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1950 Born
9 Apr 197928.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kalibo, Philippines
11 Jun 200352.9AppointedBishop of Romblon, Philippines
30 Jul 200353.1Ordained BishopBishop of Romblon, Philippines
25 May 201160.9AppointedBishop of Kalibo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jose Corazon Tumbagahan Tala-oc
Bishop Jose Corazon Tumbagahan Tala-oc (born ) Bishop of Kalibo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTagas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kalibo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,431
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast