Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jose Romeo Juanito Orquejo Lazo

Archbishop of Jaro, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1949 Born
1 Apr 197526.1Ordained PriestPriest of San Jose de Antique, Philippines
15 Nov 200354.8AppointedBishop of Kalibo, Philippines
29 Dec 200354.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kalibo, Philippines
8 Jan 200454.9InstalledBishop of Kalibo, Philippines
21 Jul 200960.4AppointedBishop of San Jose de Antique, Philippines
14 Feb 201869.0AppointedArchbishop of Jaro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jose Romeo Juanito Orquejo Lazo
Archbishop Jose Romeo Juanito Orquejo Lazo (born ) Archbishop of Jaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Jose de Buenavista, Diocese of San Jose de Antique
Ordained BishopCathedral, San Jose de Buenavista, Diocese of San Jose de Antique

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Jaro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,503
  • mn: CB, 19 Aug 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast