Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Zamboanga

Archidioecesis Zamboangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 19 May 1958
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 1,638 (632 Square Miles)
  • Web Site: http://www.cbcponline.net/jurisdictions/zamboanga.html
  • Mailing Address: Centro Pastoral, P.O. Box 1, Puerto del Sol, Gov. Camins Ave., 7000 Zamboanga City, Philippines
  • Telephone: (062)992-7668; 992-7667
  • Fax: 993-2608

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Zamboanga
10 April 1910ErectedDiocese of Cebu
Diocese of Jaro
Diocese of Zamboanga (erected)
20 January 1933Territory LostDiocese of Zamboanga Diocese of Cagayan de Oro (erected)
Archdiocese of Zamboanga
19 May 1958ElevatedDiocese of Zamboanga Archdiocese of Zamboanga
31 July 1967Territory LostArchdiocese of Zamboanga Diocese of Dipolog (erected)
24 December 1979Territory LostArchdiocese of Zamboanga Territorial Prelature of Ipil (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Zamboanga
1950289,537531,94554.4%921309,651312219ap1951
Archdiocese of Zamboanga
1970679,552887,14476.6%869778,825734937ap1971
1980503,000647,00077.7%12304211,976327428ap1981
1990390,000422,75292.3%252515,600107713ap1991
1999453,283549,72282.5%4016568,094346523ap2000
2000454,563564,77280.5%4116577,974326623ap2001
2001456,096600,12776.0%4518637,239347222ap2002
2002453,825601,79475.4%5023736,216419623ap2003
2003461,180623,21774.0%4916657,0952410724ap2004
2004474,399645,40473.5%4816647,4122210725ap2005
2010570,000735,00077.6%5124757,600268525ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Apr 2014