Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Generoso C. Camiña, P.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Digos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1931BornLeon
30 Jun 196230.6Ordained PriestPriest of Société des Missions-Étrangères
9 Mar 197846.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Davao, Philippines
9 Mar 197846.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pauzera
24 May 197846.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pauzera
20 Dec 197948.1AppointedBishop of Digos, Philippines
11 Feb 198048.2InstalledBishop of Digos, Philippines
11 Feb 200371.2ResignedBishop of Digos, Philippines
1 Feb 200775.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Digos, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Generoso C. Camiña:
Bishop Generoso C. Camiña P.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Digos

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013