Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederick Zadok Rooker

Deceased

Bishop of Jaro, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1861Born
25 Jul 188826.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 190341.7AppointedBishop of Jaro, Philippines
14 Jun 190341.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jaro, Philippines
20 Sep 190746.0DiedBishop of Jaro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Frederick Zadok Rooker
Bishop Frederick Zadok Rooker (born , died ) Bishop of Jaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY, USA

  • a priest for 19.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1,903, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast