Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Midyphil Bermejo Billones

Auxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Tagarata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1969 Born
2 Oct 199526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Jaro, Philippines
16 Jul 201950.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cebu, Philippines
16 Jul 201950.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tagarata
27 Aug 201950.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tagarata

MicroData Summary for Midyphil Bermejo Billones
Bishop Midyphil Bermejo Billones (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cebu

EventPlace
Birth PlacePan-ay (Panay), Diocese of Capiz
Ordained BishopSt. Elizabeth of Hungary, Cathedral, Iloilo City, Archdiocese of Jaro

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Cebu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2019
  • mn/bp: CB, 16 Jul 2019
  • ob: CB, 6 Aug 2019
  • c2+: CB, 19 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 29 Aug 2019

Quantcast