Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Maria Diosomito Cuenco

Deceased

Archbishop of Jaro, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1885Born
11 Jun 191429.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 194156.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jaro, Philippines
22 Nov 194156.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
27 Dec 194257.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
24 Nov 194560.5AppointedBishop of Jaro, Philippines
29 Jun 195166.1AppointedArchbishop of Jaro, Philippines
8 Oct 197287.3DiedArchbishop of Jaro, Philippines

MicroData Summary for José Maria Diosomito Cuenco
Archbishop José Maria Diosomito Cuenco (born , died ) Archbishop of Jaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarmen

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 68
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast