Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Calapan

Vicariatus Apostolicus Calapanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Moises Magpantay Cuevas, Vicar Apostolic
  • Warlito Itucas Cajandig, Vicar Apostolic Emeritus
  • Nestor Julao Adalia, Apostolic Administrator Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Elevated: 12 July 1951
  • Vicariate
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Evangelization
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 4,238 (1,636 Square Miles)
  • Description: Oriental Mindoro
  • Official Web Site: https://vicarcalapan.com
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's Residence, Salong, 5200 Calapan City, Oriental Mindoro, Philippines
  • Telephone: (043)288.3079

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Mindoro
2 July 1936ErectedDiocese of Jaro o Santa Elisabetta (Maestre de Campo)
Diocese of Lipa (Lubang, islands located in front of Calapan, BacÚ, and Puerto Galera; island of Apo; islands of Hin, Remirara, Sibay, and Caluyo, islands of Masin, Tambazon, and Buyallao)
Prefecture Apostolic of Mindoro (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Calapan
12 July 1951ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Mindoro Vicariate Apostolic of Calapan (and name change)
25 March 1953Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Calapan (Islands of Semirara, Calauya, Sibay, Libaton, Sibilon, and Libigao) Archdiocese of Jaro
20 June 1972Metropolitan ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Calapan (from Manila)
19 December 1974Territory LostDiocese of Capiz (Romblon)
Vicariate Apostolic of Calapan (Maestre de Campo island)
Diocese of Romblon (erected)
27 January 1983Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Calapan (Occidental Mindoro) Vicariate Apostolic of San Jose in Mindoro (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Mindoro
1950138,000170,00081.2%22226,2722112ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Calapan
1969334,700395,70084.6%154556,085582928ap1971
1980482,000609,00079.1%951608,033544430ap1981
1990514,972603,25285.4%16264212,261495219ap1991
1999564,570643,28787.8%3621579,904427321ap2000
2000621,027707,67687.8%38215910,525426921ap2001
2001647,000738,42287.6%36165212,442397521ap2002
2002621,027717,67686.5%39205910,525436921ap2003
2003649,057721,17590.0%44105412,019217921ap2004
2004621,027707,67687.8%45145910,525257020ap2005
2010756,000814,00092.9%42196112,393197923ap2011
2014814,000877,00092.8%39205913,796207023ap2015
2017855,580921,74092.8%44246812,582247423ap2018
2020896,190965,50092.8%45216613,578216723ap2021
2022920,000992,00092.7%51227312,602246123ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Prefecture Apostolic of Mindoro
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 29, Page 261, and Page 262
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Calapan
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 44, Page 170, and Page 171

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024