Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacinto Placido Cardinal Zurla, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Studies

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

Titular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1769BornLegnano, Italy
10 Mar 182353.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 182353.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
13 Jan 182454.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
18 Jan 182454.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
3 Jul 183061.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
29 Oct 183465.5DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Placido Zurla (VIAF: 59851168)
Giacinto Placido Cardinal Zurla O.S.B. (born , died ) Prefect of Studies

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
  • a cardinal for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 184
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1824, Number 4
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016