Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Amatore Lobetti

Deceased

Bishop of Asti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1772Born
25 Jan 179522.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 183159.5SelectedBishop of Asti, Italy
24 Feb 183259.8ConfirmedBishop of Asti, Italy
18 Mar 183259.9Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
21 Mar 184067.9DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Amatore Lobetti
Bishop Michele Amatore Lobetti (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuneo

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast