Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Scalabrini, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1767BornTrapani
17 Dec 179124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
16 Aug 183264.8SelectedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
17 Dec 183265.2ConfirmedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
23 Dec 183265.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
4 Jul 184274.7DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Scalabrini:
Bishop Luigi Scalabrini O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013