Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe de Nobili

Deceased

Archbishop of Lucca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1756BornBrussels
21 Apr 178326.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 182669.6AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
9 Jul 182669.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
29 Mar 183679.4DiedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe de Nobili (VIAF: 88775354)
Archbishop Giuseppe de Nobili (born , died ) Archbishop of Lucca

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jun 2016