Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Manfrin Provedi

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1750BornVenezia
17 Dec 177424.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 181868.1SelectedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
23 Aug 181968.8ConfirmedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
17 Oct 181969.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
26 Jan 182978.2DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Manfrin Provedi
Bishop Giuseppe Manfrin Provedi (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 154
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 May 2016