Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Michael Baggs

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Pella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1806Born
Nov 1830³24.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of London District, England, Great Britain
5 Dec 183024.5Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
9 Jan 184437.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
9 Jan 184437.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pella
28 Jan 184437.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pella
16 Oct 184539.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Michael Baggs (VIAF: 30276978)
Bishop Charles Michael Baggs (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelville, County Westmeath, Diocese of Meath, Ireland
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Gregorio in Caelo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlacePrior Park, Bath, Somerset, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England
Buried Place (Original)Prior Park, Bath, Somerset, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England
Buried Place (Current)Holy Souls, Cemetery, Arnos Vale, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England

  • a priest for 14.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 302
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 27
  • od: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 5
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast