Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Nurigian (Nouridjan)

Deceased

Archbishop of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian)


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Jul 1830AppointedArchbishop of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian), Turkey
11 Jul 1830Ordained BishopArchbishop of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian), Turkey
4 Feb 1838DiedArchbishop of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Antonio Nurigian (Nouridjan)
Archbishop Antonio Nurigian (Nouridjan) (died ) Archbishop of Constantinople (Istanbul)

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 162
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016