Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Baptiste Auvergne

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Iconium

Vicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

Apostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of

Apostolic Delegate to Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1793BornNÓmes, France
29 Mar 183339.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
29 Mar 183339.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Syria
29 Mar 183339.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of
1 May 183339.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Iconium
7 Jun 183339.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria
7 Sep 1836³42.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Iconium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Auvergne (VIAF: 88678827)
Archbishop Jean-Baptiste Auvergne (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Iconium

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 222
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1833, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Aug 2016