Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Francesco Paolo Maria Bovio, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1774Born
30 Nov 179824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Apr 182954.3SelectedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
18 May 182954.5ConfirmedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
24 May 182954.5Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
6 Nov 184772.9DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Francesco Paolo Maria Bovio (VIAF: 88751331)
Bishop Luigi Francesco Paolo Maria Bovio O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBitonto

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 261
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018