Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vito Angelo Salvemini

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1786BornMolfetta
17 Mar 181024.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 183246.1SelectedArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
2 Jul 183246.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
15 Jul 183246.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
13 May 185468.2DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy

MicroData Summary for Vito Angelo Salvemini (VIAF: 89459941)
Archbishop Vito Angelo Salvemini (born , died ) Archbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste)

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1842
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 347
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Jul 2016