Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Joseph Williams

Deceased

Archbishop of Boston, Massachusetts


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1822BornBoston
17 May 184523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
9 Jan 186643.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
9 Jan 186643.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
13 Feb 186643.8SucceededBishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
11 Mar 186643.9Ordained BishopBishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
12 Feb 187552.8AppointedArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
30 Aug 190785.3DiedArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Williams:
Archbishop John Joseph Williams (born , died ) Archbishop of Boston

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 153, and Page 567

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013