Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Loughlin

Deceased

Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1817Born
18 Oct 184022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
29 Jul 185335.6AppointedBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
30 Oct 185335.8Ordained BishopBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
29 Dec 189174.0DiedBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Loughlin (VIAF: 38655708)
Bishop John Loughlin (born , died ) Bishop of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrumboniff, Diocese of Down and Connor, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick's (Mott St), Cathedral, New York, Diocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 159
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017