Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Conroy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Albany, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Curium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1819³Born
21 May 184222.8Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
7 Jul 186545.9AppointedBishop of Albany, New York, USA
15 Oct 186546.2Ordained BishopBishop of Albany, New York, USA
12 Oct 187758.2ResignedBishop of Albany, New York, USA
22 Mar 187858.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Curium
20 Nov 189576.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Albany, New York, USA

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Conroy
Bishop John Joseph Conroy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Albany

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClonaslee, Diocese of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland, Ireland
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Albany, Diocese of Albany, New York

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 85, and Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017