Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Mary Bradley

Deceased

Bishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1846Born
3 Jun 187125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Portland, Maine, USA
18 Apr 188438.1AppointedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
11 Jun 188438.2Ordained BishopBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
13 Dec 190357.8DiedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA

MicroData Summary for Denis Mary Bradley (VIAF: 315679729)
Bishop Denis Mary Bradley (born , died ) Bishop of Manchester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle Island, Diocese of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Manchester, Diocese of Manchester, New Hampshire

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 362
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017