Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Daniel Beaven

Deceased

Bishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1851Born
18 Dec 187524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
9 Aug 189241.4AppointedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
18 Oct 189241.6Ordained BishopBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
25 Oct 192069.6DiedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Daniel Beaven
Bishop Thomas Daniel Beaven (born , died ) Bishop of Springfield in Massachusetts

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpringfield, MA, Diocese of Springfield in Massachusetts
Ordained BishopSt. Michael, Cathedral, Springfield, MA, Diocese of Springfield in Massachusetts

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 177
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017