Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Brady

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts

Titular Bishop of Alabanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1842BornKilnaleck, Ireland
4 Dec 186422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
19 Jun 189149.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
19 Jun 189149.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Alabanda
5 Aug 189149.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alabanda
6 Jan 191067.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for John Brady:
Bishop John Brady (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Boston

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013