Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gaudentius Anderson

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Myrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1865Born
20 May 189226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
29 Apr 190943.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
29 Apr 190943.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrina
25 Jul 190943.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myrina
2 Jul 192761.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gaudentius Anderson
Bishop Joseph Gaudentius Anderson (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast