Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew A. Harkins

Deceased

Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1845Born
22 May 186923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
11 Feb 188741.2AppointedBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
14 Apr 188741.4Ordained BishopBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
25 May 192175.5DiedBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

MicroData Summary for Matthew A. Harkins
Bishop Matthew A. Harkins (born , died ) Bishop of Providence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston, Diocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Providence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 470
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017