Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Szczepan Wesoly

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gniezno, Poland

Titular Archbishop of Dragonara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1926Born
28 Oct 195630.0Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
11 Dec 196842.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
11 Dec 196842.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dragonara
7 Feb 196942.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dragonara
7 Feb 199467.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dragonara
8 Apr 200376.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
28 Aug 201891.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Szczepan Wesoly (VIAF: 18027454)
Archbishop Szczepan Wesoly (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKatowice, Diocese of Katowice
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Warszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Katowice, Archdiocese of Katowice

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 49.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1969, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Aug 2018

Quantcast