Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Francis Flannelly

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Metelis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1894Born
1 Sep 191823.8Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
9 Nov 194854.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
9 Nov 194854.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Metelis
16 Dec 194854.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metelis
8 Nov 196975.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
23 May 197378.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Francis Flannelly
Bishop Joseph Francis Flannelly (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1948, Number 138
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 Sep 2020

Quantcast