Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giulio Arrigoni, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lucca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1806Born
19 Sep 182922.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
18 Dec 183024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
5 Nov 184943.1AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
30 Dec 184943.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
13 Jan 185043.3InstalledArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
10 Jan 187568.3DiedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Arrigoni (VIAF: 28746485)
Archbishop Giulio Arrigoni O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Archbishop of Lucca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 350
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1849, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017