Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Gilpin Bagshawe, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nottingham, England

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1829BornLondon
24 Oct 184920.8ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
6 Mar 185223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
10 Oct 187445.7AppointedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
12 Nov 187445.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
25 Nov 1901³72.9ResignedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
27 Jan 190273.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hypaepa
17 Jan 190475.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
6 Feb 191586.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Nottingham, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Gilpin Bagshawe:
Archbishop Edward Gilpin Bagshawe C.O. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nottingham

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 312, and Page 418

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013