Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Charles Casartelli

Deceased

Bishop of Salford, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1852Born
10 Sep 187623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salford, England, Great Britain
28 Aug 190350.7AppointedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
21 Sep 190350.8Ordained BishopBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
18 Jan 192572.1DiedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Louis Charles Casartelli (VIAF: 15151070)
Bishop Louis Charles Casartelli (born , died ) Bishop of Salford

EventPlace
Birth Place2 Clarence Street, Cheetham Hill, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained PriestSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Salford, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Salford, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Death PlaceSt. Bede, College, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Moston, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 43
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 60
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 31 Mar 2018