Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Carroll

Deceased

Bishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1838Born
22 Dec 186123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
22 Aug 189355.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
22 Aug 189355.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Acmonia
28 Oct 189355.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acmonia
11 May 189557.1SucceededBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
14 Jan 189758.8DiedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Carroll
Bishop John Carroll (born , died ) Bishop of Shrewsbury

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastleblaney, County Monaghan, Diocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady, Birkenhead

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 73, and Page 493
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 58
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018