Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Edward Joseph Mostyn

Deceased

Archbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1860Born
14 Sep 188424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
4 Jul 189534.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Wales, Wales, Great Britain
4 Jul 189534.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
14 Sep 189535.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
14 May 189837.7AppointedBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
7 Mar 192160.5AppointedArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
16 Apr 192160.6InstalledArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
25 Oct 193979.2DiedArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Francis Edward Joseph Mostyn (VIAF: 89263437)
Archbishop Francis Edward Joseph Mostyn (born , died ) Archbishop of Cardiff

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTalacre, Flintshire, Diocese of Menevia, Wales
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Birkenhead

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 125, and Page 380
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 154
  • mn/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018