Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Vertue (Virtue)

Deceased

Bishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1826Born
20 Dec 185125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
13 Jun 188256.1AppointedBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
25 Jul 188256.2Ordained BishopBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
23 May 190074.0DiedBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Vertue (Virtue) (VIAF: 100806599)
Bishop John Vertue (Virtue) (born , died ) Bishop of Portsmouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewman Street, Holborn, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Victories, Pro-Cathedral, Kensington, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceBishop's House, Edinburgh Road, Portsmouth, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Highland Road, Southsea, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 467
  • c4: CB, 12 Nov 2014
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 204
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 42
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast