Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Biermans, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}

Titular Bishop of Gargara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1871BornWesterhoven, Netherlands
25 Jul 189624.7Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
24 Apr 191240.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}, Uganda
24 Apr 191240.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gargara
1 Sep 191240.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gargara
Aug 1924³52.7AppointedSuperior General of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
1934²62.1ResignedSuperior General of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
24 Jan 194169.2DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}, Uganda

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Biermans:
Bishop Johannes Biermans M.H.M. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013