Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Pelvi

Archbishop of Foggia-Bovino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1948 BornNapoli
18 Apr 197324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
11 Dec 199951.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
11 Dec 199951.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thinisa in Numidia
5 Feb 200051.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thinisa in Numidia
14 Oct 200658.2AppointedArchbishop of Italy, Military
11 Aug 201365.0RetiredArchbishop of Italy, Military
11 Oct 201466.2AppointedArchbishop of Foggia-Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Pelvi:
Archbishop Vincenzo Pelvi (born ) Archbishop of Foggia-Bovino

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Foggia-Bovino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,694
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Aug 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 11 Oct 2014