Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorio Longo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

Titular Bishop of Loryma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1901BornNapoli
11 Jun 192726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
23 Jan 195654.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
23 Jan 195654.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
22 Apr 195654.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
7 Nov 197473.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Longo:
Bishop Vittorio Longo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Mar 2014