Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guerino Di Tora

Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

Titular Bishop of Zuri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1946 BornRoma
14 Mar 197124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1 Jun 200962.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1 Jun 200962.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zuri
11 Jul 200962.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zuri

MicroData Summary for Guerino Di Tora:
Bishop Guerino Di Tora (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013