Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Diligenza

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Capua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1921BornArzano
8 Aug 194322.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Mar 197857.0AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
23 Apr 197857.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Capua, Italy
29 Apr 199776.2RetiredArchbishop of Capua, Italy
25 May 201190.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Diligenza
Archbishop Luigi Diligenza (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Capua

  • a priest for 67.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 26 May 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 May 2016