Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Palombella

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1898BornAcquaviva delle Fonti
24 Feb 192325.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 194648.1AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
19 May 194648.3Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
3 Jan 195152.9AppointedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
2 Jul 195456.4AppointedArchbishop of Matera, Italy
12 Jun 197476.3RetiredArchbishop of Matera, Italy
31 Jan 197779.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Palombella:
Archbishop Giacomo Palombella (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Matera

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/m236: CB, 18 Jan 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015