Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Giudice

Bishop of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1956 Born
27 Sep 198630.0Ordained PriestPriest of Teggiano-Policastro, Italy
24 Mar 201154.5AppointedBishop of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno, Italy
13 May 201154.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Giudice
Bishop Giuseppe Giudice (born ) Bishop of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSala Consilina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nocera Inferiore-Sarno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,056

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast