Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abel Cahiles Apigo

Bishop of Mati, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1968 Born
18 Apr 199425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Davao, Philippines
10 Feb 201849.7AppointedBishop of Mati, Philippines
24 Apr 201849.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mati, Philippines
25 Apr 201849.9InstalledBishop of Mati, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Abel Cahiles Apigo
Bishop Abel Cahiles Apigo (born ) Bishop of Mati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalinan, Archdiocese of Davao
Ordained BishopSan Pedro, Cathedral, Davao City, Archdiocese of Davao

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mati.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2018
  • mn: CB, 11 Feb 2018
  • c1/ob/i: CB, 28 Feb 2018
  • c2+: CB, 19 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast