Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Beluso Rimando

Auxiliary Bishop of Davao, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Vada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1953 Born
22 Apr 198027.1Ordained PriestPriest of Davao, Philippines
4 Mar 200653.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Davao, Philippines
4 Mar 200653.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vada
25 May 200653.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vada

MicroData Summary for George Beluso Rimando
Bishop George Beluso Rimando (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Davao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTagum

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Davao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,162

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast