Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tagum

Dioecesis Tagamnus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Wilfredo D. Manlapaz, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 October 1980
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Davao
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 8,129 (3,139 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises most of the province of Davao del Norte
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, Rizal St., Tagum City, 8100 Davao, Philippines
  • Telephone: (084)21.81.402
  • Fax: 21.82.878

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Tagum
13 January 1962ErectedTerritorial Prelature of Tagum (erected)
Diocese of Tagum
11 October 1980ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Tagum Diocese of Tagum
16 February 1984Territory LostDiocese of Tagum Diocese of Mati (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Tagum
1970490,000565,00086.7%4135766,447366022ap1971
Diocese of Tagum
1980691,000860,00080.3%21133420,323188323ap1981
1990781,000891,00087.7%3744119,04896919ap1991
1999995,0001,381,12972.0%6226415,54669721ap2000
2000995,0161,381,14572.0%666615,07629923ap2001
20011,035,1141,422,57972.8%777713,44328826ap2002
20021,106,3321,576,28270.2%767614,557111030ap2003
20031,106,4811,576,55970.2%7527714,369211630ap2004
20041,106,5001,577,00070.2%7537814,185312330ap2005
20101,203,5681,738,00069.3%9329512,669210939ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.7, 29 Jan 2012; data: 11 Feb 2012