Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Medil Sacay Aseo

Bishop of Tagum, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1954 Born
7 Apr 197924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tagum, Philippines
7 Apr 201863.7AppointedBishop of Tagum, Philippines
20 Jun 201863.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tagum, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Medil Sacay Aseo
Bishop Medil Sacay Aseo (born ) Bishop of Tagum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManiki, Kapaong, Davao del Norte, Territorial Prelature of Tagum
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Tagum, Diocese of Tagum

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tagum.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2018
  • ob: CB, 7 May 2018
  • c2+: CB, 15 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jun 2018

Quantcast