Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matthias U Shwe

Archbishop Emeritus of Taunggyi, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1943 Born
12 Apr 196925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Taunggyi, Myanmar
20 Dec 197936.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Taunggyi, Myanmar
20 Dec 197936.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzippari
13 Dec 198037.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzippari
18 Dec 198946.0AppointedBishop of Taunggyi, Myanmar
17 Jan 199854.1AppointedArchbishop of Taunggyi, Myanmar
12 Apr 201571.3ResignedArchbishop of Taunggyi, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Matthias U Shwe
Archbishop Matthias U Shwe (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Taunggyi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKamai

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Taunggyi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast