Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Saw Po Ray

Bishop of Mawlamyine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1948 BornMergui
13 Apr 197526.7Ordained PriestPriest of Rangoon, Myanmar
3 Jul 198738.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rangoon, Myanmar
3 Jul 198738.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Buffada
8 Dec 198739.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buffada
22 Mar 199344.6AppointedBishop of Mawlamyine, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Raymond Saw Po Ray:
Bishop Raymond Saw Po Ray (born ) Bishop of Mawlamyine

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mawlamyine.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,801

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013