Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Hla

Bishop of Pekhon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1952 BornHwary
8 Mar 198129.1Ordained PriestPriest of Taunggyi, Myanmar
13 Mar 200149.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Taunggyi, Myanmar
13 Mar 200149.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum in Numidia
15 Dec 200149.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum in Numidia
15 Dec 200553.9AppointedBishop of Pekhon, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Peter Hla:
Bishop Peter Hla (born ) Bishop of Pekhon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pekhon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,087
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013